TN HB2617 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, imposes a gross receipts tax on the sale of opioids. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As introduced, imposes a gross receipts tax on the sale of opioids. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
Rep. Bo Mitchell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/18 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/4/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2445 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee