TN HB2610 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Taken off notice for cal. in Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Taken off notice for cal. in Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires guide signs for recreation sites or cultural interest areas located in counties with a population less than 100,000 along state highways to be for those sites or areas that have a minimum annual attendance of at least 30 percent of the population of the county. - Amends TCA Title 54.
Title
As introduced, requires guide signs for recreation sites or cultural interest areas located in counties with a population less than 100,000 along state highways to be for those sites or areas that have a minimum annual attendance of at least 30 percent of the population of the county. - Amends TCA Title 54.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Transportation Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 6/4/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Infrastructure Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Infrastructure Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2599 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee