TN HB2607 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires TACIR to report to the chairs of the state and local government committee of the senate and the local government committee of the house of representatives on the effects of Public Chapter 1101 of 1998 and recommendations as to whether local governments should be required to develop new growth plans. - Amends TCA Title 6; Title 7; Title 13 and Chapter 1101 of the Public Acts of 1998.
Title
As introduced, requires TACIR to report to the chairs of the state and local government committee of the senate and the local government committee of the house of representatives on the effects of Public Chapter 1101 of 1998 and recommendations as to whether local governments should be required to develop new growth plans. - Amends TCA Title 6; Title 7; Title 13 and Chapter 1101 of the Public Acts of 1998.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2759 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee