TN HB2605 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of children's services to develop instructional guidelines for child safety training programs for members of professions that frequently deal with children who may be at risk of abuse; requires the board of social worker licensure to create child safety training programs; requires licensees of the board of social worker licensure to complete the appropriate child safety training program prior to license renewal. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1, Part 4; Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 1; Title 63, Chapter 23; Title 63, Chapter 6, Part 2; Title 63, Chapter 7, Part 1 and Title 63, Chapter 9.
Title
As introduced, requires the department of children's services to develop instructional guidelines for child safety training programs for members of professions that frequently deal with children who may be at risk of abuse; requires the board of social worker licensure to create child safety training programs; requires licensees of the board of social worker licensure to complete the appropriate child safety training program prior to license renewal. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1, Part 4; Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 1; Title 63, Chapter 23; Title 63, Chapter 6, Part 2; Title 63, Chapter 7, Part 1 and Title 63, Chapter 9.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2404 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee