TN HB2602 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Failed in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases the hourly minimum wage to $20.00, or the federal minimum wage established pursuant to the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938, whichever rate is greater. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 23; Title 12, Chapter 4, Part 4 and Title 50, Chapter 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 23; Title 12, Chapter 4, Part 4 and Title 50, Chapter 2, relative to minimum wage.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-12HouseFailed in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
2024-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/12/2024
2024-02-27HouseAction Def. in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee to 3/12/2024
2024-02-21HousePlaced on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 2/27/2024
2024-02-21HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2024-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
2024-02-05HouseP2C, ref. to Commerce Committee- Government Operations for Review
2024-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2024-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2646 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-12 - Failed in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee / no second

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback