TN HB2596 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides that an owner, tenant, or lessee is not liable for injuries to a person that occur when the person is on the land of the owner, tenant, or lessee without paying to the owner, tenant, or lessee a valuable consideration for use of the land for the purpose of entering or exiting from or using a public greenway, unless the injuries were caused by the gross negligence or willful and wanton misconduct of the owner, tenant, or lessee. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 28; Title 29; Title 54; Title 55; Title 64; Title 65; Title 66 and Title 69.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7; Title 28; Title 29; Title 54; Title 55; Title 64; Title 65; Title 66 and Title 69, relative to rights-of-way.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 790 | |
2022-03-21 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-03-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2022-02-16 | House | Ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2468 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-13 - Effective date(s) 04/08/2022