TN HB2593 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 737
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 737
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the statute of limitations for civil actions based on injury or illness resulting from child sexual abuse that occurred when the person was a minor but was not discovered until after the person became an adult to three years from the discovery of the abuse. - Amends TCA Title 28, Chapter 3, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, extends the statute of limitations for civil actions based on injury or illness resulting from child sexual abuse that occurred when the person was a minor but was not discovered until after the person became an adult to three years from the discovery of the abuse. - Amends TCA Title 28, Chapter 3, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Rep. Bill Beck [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Jason Powell [D] |
Rep. Joe Armstrong [D] | Rep. Courtney Rogers [R] | Rep. Eddie Smith [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] |
Rep. Kevin Dunlap [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Pub. Ch. 737 | |
2016-04-26 | Effective date(s) 04/07/2016 | |
2016-04-07 | Signed by Governor. | |
2016-03-29 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-03-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-03-22 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0635) |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-03-01 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-02-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-29 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-02-29 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0616) |
2016-02-25 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/29/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/25/2016 |
2016-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-23 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/17/2016 |
2016-02-04 | House | Sponsor change. |
2016-02-04 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2016-02-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | P1C. |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro. |
2016-01-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2484 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 737