TN HB2585 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 965
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 965
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises and expands the manner in which the secretary of state and county election commissions must audit state and local elections. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 20 and Title 2, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 20 and Title 2, Chapter 5, relative to elections.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. Todd Warner [R] |
Rep. John Crawford [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] |
Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] |
Rep. Dennis Powers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 965 | |
2022-04-25 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/25/2022 |
2022-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-19 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/19/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/19/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/13/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2022-03-07 | House | Sponsor change. |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2675 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-06 - Effective date(s) 05/02/2022