TN HB2576 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration & Planning
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration & Planning
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from July 1 to August 1 the date by which the department must submit its annual report on virtual education programs to the governor, the general assembly, the state board of education, and the BEP review committee. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, changes from July 1 to August 1 the date by which the department must submit its annual report on virtual education programs to the governor, the general assembly, the state board of education, and the BEP review committee. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration & Planning |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/20/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2431 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee