TN HB2576 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 906
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Public Safety Act of 2016." - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6; Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1; Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 1; Title 40, Chapter 28; Title 40, Chapter 35 and Title 41, Chapter 1, Part 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, enacts the "Public Safety Act of 2016." - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6; Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1; Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 1; Title 40, Chapter 28; Title 40, Chapter 35 and Title 41, Chapter 1, Part 4.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-02 Pub. Ch. 906
2016-05-02 Effective date(s) 04/27/2016; 01/01/2017
2016-04-27 Signed by Governor.
2016-04-22HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2016-04-22SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2016-04-22HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2016-04-22HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2016-04-19SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 4
2016-04-19SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0782)
2016-04-19SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2016-04-11SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2016-04-07HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2016-04-07HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-04-07HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 4
2016-04-07HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0898)
2016-04-07HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0897)
2016-03-31HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/7/2016
2016-03-30HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2016
2016-03-29HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2016-03-23HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/29/2016
2016-03-23HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2016-03-16HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/23/2016
2016-03-16HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2016-03-16HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2016-03-09HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/16/2016
2016-03-09HouseAction def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/16/2016
2016-03-02HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/9/2016
2016-03-01HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2016-02-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/1/2016
2016-02-23HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/1/2016
2016-02-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/23/2016
2016-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2016-01-27HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2016-01-25HouseP1C.
2016-01-21HouseIntro.
2016-01-21HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2567 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 906

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback