TN HB2571 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the state board of education to submit a report to the general assembly, no later than February 1, 2025, regarding the feasibility of reducing the maximum class size in all classrooms that include students with disabilities and students eligible for special education services by 10 percent by the 2026-2027 school year. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to class sizes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2492 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee