TN HB2568 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires any facility in which more than 50 abortions were performed during the previous calendar year to post a sign informing patients that a chemical abortion may be reversed following the first dose of a two-dose treatment; requires a patient to receive similar notice prior to and after having the first dose of a chemical abortion; provides criminal penalties and civil actions for any violation of the act. - Amends TCA Title 11; Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 2; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, requires any facility in which more than 50 abortions were performed during the previous calendar year to post a sign informing patients that a chemical abortion may be reversed following the first dose of a two-dose treatment; requires a patient to receive similar notice prior to and after having the first dose of a chemical abortion; provides criminal penalties and civil actions for any violation of the act. - Amends TCA Title 11; Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 2; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY LAMAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY JOHNSON G. PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY LAMAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY JOHNSON G. PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-01 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-01 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 71, Nays 22, PNV 1 |
2020-06-01 | House | Am. tabled. (Amendment 3 - HA0761) |
2020-06-01 | House | Am. tabled. (Amendment 2 - HA0759) |
2020-06-01 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0644) |
2020-05-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/1/2020 |
2020-03-20 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 6-1-20 |
2020-03-18 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 3-20-20 |
2020-03-16 | House | Reset on cal. for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Reset on Health Committee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Health Subcommittee to 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2465 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020