TN HB2558 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes Gaylord Springs Golf Links to seek a caterer license and to grant a franchise for purposes of consumption of alcoholic beverages on the premises; designates the Wildhorse Saloon as a restaurant for purposes of consumption of alcoholic beverages on the premises; authorizes the General Jackson Showboat to sell alcoholic beverages for consumption on the premises of its principal dock. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, authorizes Gaylord Springs Golf Links to seek a caterer license and to grant a franchise for purposes of consumption of alcoholic beverages on the premises; designates the Wildhorse Saloon as a restaurant for purposes of consumption of alcoholic beverages on the premises; authorizes the General Jackson Showboat to sell alcoholic beverages for consumption on the premises of its principal dock. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Meeting Canceled. Reset on State Committee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2480 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee