TN HB2555 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal. in Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal. in Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that any proposed increase to an existing administrative fee that exceeds the lesser of 5 percent or the average annual rate of inflation for the immediately preceding calendar year be proposed in the form of a legislative bill or amendment to a legislative bill rather than an administrative rule. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 62; Title 63; Title 68; Title 69 and Title 70.
Title
As introduced, requires that any proposed increase to an existing administrative fee that exceeds the lesser of 5 percent or the average annual rate of inflation for the immediately preceding calendar year be proposed in the form of a legislative bill or amendment to a legislative bill rather than an administrative rule. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 62; Title 63; Title 68; Title 69 and Title 70.
Sponsors
Rep. Tilman Goins [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] |
Rep. Martin Daniel [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] |
Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 48 N: 37 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Action def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-17 | House | Re-ref. Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | Failed to pass H., Ayes 48, Nays 37, PNV 7 |
2018-04-17 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1044) |
2018-04-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-12 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/5/2018 |
2018-04-02 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee with a Neutral Recommendation |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2018-03-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Sponsor change. |
2018-02-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2715 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-19 - Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee