TN HB2554 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-28 - Assigned to s/c Infrastructure Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-28 - Assigned to s/c Infrastructure Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the department of transportation to make provisions for persons to report litterers via text. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 7, Part 3; Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 5; Section 41-2-123; Title 54, Chapter 1, Part 4 and Title 54, Chapter 5, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the department of transportation to make provisions for persons to report litterers via text. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 7, Part 3; Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 5; Section 41-2-123; Title 54, Chapter 1, Part 4 and Title 54, Chapter 5, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Infrastructure Subcommittee |
2020-02-28 | House | Ref. to Transportation Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2364 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation & Safety Committee.