TN HB2545 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Taken off notice for cal. in Consumer and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits private employers with 50 or more employees and public employers from making employment decisions with regard to an applicant or current employee based on wage or salary history. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 12 and Title 50.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits private employers with 50 or more employees and public employers from making employment decisions with regard to an applicant or current employee based on wage or salary history. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 12 and Title 50.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-04HouseTaken off notice for cal. in Consumer and Human Resources Committee
2020-05-27HousePlaced on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 6/4/2020
2020-03-16HouseMeeting Canceled
2020-03-11HousePlaced on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 3/16/2020
2020-03-10HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
2020-03-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Employee Affairs Subcommittee for 3/10/2020
2020-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee
2020-02-10HouseP2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
2020-02-06HouseP1C.
2020-02-05HouseIntro.
2020-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2641 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-03 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 12/1/2020

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback