TN HB2538 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts water sold by a public utility to a consumer for residential use from sales and use taxes. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, exempts water sold by a public utility to a consumer for residential use from sales and use taxes. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1949 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee