TN HB2536 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates a civil action against any person or government entity that infringes upon a person's right to bear arms under the Tennessee or United States Constitutions; requires the person or entity to be liable for actual or statutory damages, punitive damages, attorney's fees, and court costs. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 54 and Title 8, Chapter 47.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, creates a civil action against any person or government entity that infringes upon a person's right to bear arms under the Tennessee or United States Constitutions; requires the person or entity to be liable for actual or statutory damages, punitive damages, attorney's fees, and court costs. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 54 and Title 8, Chapter 47.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-11HouseReset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-06-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/11/2020
2020-06-10HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-06-03HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/8/2020
2020-06-02HouseAction def. in Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020
2020-05-27HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/2/2020
2020-05-27HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee
2020-05-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 5/27/2020
2020-03-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2020-03-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/17/2020
2020-03-10HouseAction Def. in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee to 3/17/2020
2020-03-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/10/2020
2020-03-03HouseAction Def. in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee to 3/10/2020
2020-02-26HousePlaced on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/3/2020
2020-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
2020-02-10HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2020-02-06HouseP1C.
2020-02-05HouseIntro.
2020-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2614 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback