TN HB2530 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Reassigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Reassigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that a person filing a petition for expunction of that person's public records involving offenses related to the person's status as a victim of human trafficking must not have been convicted of any federal offenses or offenses in any other state. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 32.
Title
As introduced, specifies that a person filing a petition for expunction of that person's public records involving offenses related to the person's status as a victim of human trafficking must not have been convicted of any federal offenses or offenses in any other state. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 32.
Sponsors
Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | House | Reassigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee |
2020-02-25 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Action Def. in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee to 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2811 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee