TN HB2524 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - Taken off notice for cal. in Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - Taken off notice for cal. in Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, eliminates the criminal offenses of possession of a firearm or club with intent to go armed, possession of a deadly weapon other than a firearm with the intent to employ it during the commission of a dangerous offense, possession of a deadly weapon with the intent to employ it during the commission of any offense other than a dangerous offense, and possession of a weapon with intent to go armed in a park, playground, civic center, or other recreational building. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, relative to weapons.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Todd Warner [R] |
Rep. Rusty Grills [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. David Byrd [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] |
Rep. Clay Doggett [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Mark Hall [R] | Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] |
Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Scotty Campbell [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] |
Rep. Tim Hicks [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 4/13/2022 |
2022-03-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-29 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-03-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2866 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-06 - Deferred to Summer Study