TN HB2520 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 917
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 917
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits a sentencing court from making a sentencing determination based in whole or in part on defendant’s consent or refusal to consent to any form of temporary or permanent birth control, sterilization, or family planning services regardless of whether the defendant’s consent is voluntarily given; prohibits courts accepting a guilty plea agreement or plea of nolo contendere, or imposing a sentence, if any part of the plea or sentence is in whole or in part conditioned or based upon the criminal defendant submitting to any form of temporary or permanent birth control, sterilization, or family planning services, regardless of whether the defendant's consent is voluntarily given. - Amends TCA Title 40.
Title
As enacted, prohibits a sentencing court from making a sentencing determination based in whole or in part on defendant’s consent or refusal to consent to any form of temporary or permanent birth control, sterilization, or family planning services regardless of whether the defendant’s consent is voluntarily given; prohibits courts accepting a guilty plea agreement or plea of nolo contendere, or imposing a sentence, if any part of the plea or sentence is in whole or in part conditioned or based upon the criminal defendant submitting to any form of temporary or permanent birth control, sterilization, or family planning services, regardless of whether the defendant's consent is voluntarily given. - Amends TCA Title 40.
Sponsors
Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] | Rep. Rick Staples [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 917 | |
2018-04-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-17 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-04-02 | House | Re-ref. Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-03-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2133 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 917