TN HB2517 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-11)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 803
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-11)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 803
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing drug-free school zones and school safety zones and sentences related to violations. - Amends TCA Title 16, Chapter 2; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4 and Section 49-2-116.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing drug-free school zones and school safety zones and sentences related to violations. - Amends TCA Title 16, Chapter 2; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4 and Section 49-2-116.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 803 | |
2020-06-17 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-06-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/17/2020 |
2020-06-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-15 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Action def. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 6/9/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-02-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2734 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 803