TN HB2515 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Placed behind the budget
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, adds certain positions within the offices of district attorneys general and district public defenders. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14; Title 8, Chapter 7 and Title 16.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, adds certain positions within the offices of district attorneys general and district public defenders. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14; Title 8, Chapter 7 and Title 16.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HousePlaced behind the budget
2020-03-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/11/2020
2020-03-04HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2020-02-26HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2020-02-19HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary Committee for 2/26/2020
2020-02-18HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2020-02-12HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/18/2020
2020-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2020-02-10HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2020-02-06HouseP1C.
2020-02-05HouseIntro.
2020-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2731 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback