TN HB2514 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 882
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 882
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a special occasion licensee to designate an area in which liquor-by-the-drink licensees may sell alcoholic beverages and beer to patrons who may consume the alcoholic beverages and beer anywhere in the designated area; authorizes a festival operator licensee to provide a list of the liquor-by-the-drink licensees that will sell alcoholic beverages and beer to patrons in the designated area of the festival. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, relative to consumption of alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 882 | |
2022-03-31 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-03-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/31/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2270 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 04/14/2022