TN HB2510 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 50-14)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 998
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 50-14)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 998
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that every notice of violation or citation issued that is based solely upon evidence obtained from any traffic enforcement camera used to enforce or monitor traffic violations of the requirement that motor vehicles stop at a red light, include a disclaimer stating that nonpayment of the notice or citation cannot adversely affect the person's credit score or report, driver's license, and/or automobile insurance rates. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 50 and Title 55, Chapter 8.
Title
As enacted, requires that every notice of violation or citation issued that is based solely upon evidence obtained from any traffic enforcement camera used to enforce or monitor traffic violations of the requirement that motor vehicles stop at a red light, include a disclaimer stating that nonpayment of the notice or citation cannot adversely affect the person's credit score or report, driver's license, and/or automobile insurance rates. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 50 and Title 55, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 998 | |
2016-04-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-18 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-04-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-14 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/14/2016 |
2016-04-12 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/12/2016 |
2016-04-06 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-30 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/6/2016 |
2016-03-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/9/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2016-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | P1C. |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro. |
2016-01-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2492 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 998
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2510&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB2510.pdf |