TN HB2502 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Failed in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Failed in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Medical Autonomy Related to Cannabis Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 29; Title 33; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 43; Title 45; Title 50; Title 53; Title 57; Title 63; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 29; Title 33; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 43; Title 45; Title 50; Title 53; Title 57; Title 63; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to the "Tennessee Medical Autonomy Related to Cannabis Act."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | House | Failed in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee- Criminal Justice Committee - Government Operations for Review |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2104 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee