TN HB2501 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires political communications to contain a disclaimer if the communication was generated in whole or in part by synthetic media using artificial intelligence algorithms. - Amends TCA Title 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, relative to political communications.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-06HouseFailed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
2024-02-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/6/2024
2024-02-28HouseAction Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 3/6/2024
2024-02-21HousePlaced on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/28/2024
2024-02-21HouseAction Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 2/28/2024
2024-02-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/21/2024
2024-02-06HouseAssigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
2024-02-01HouseP2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
2024-01-31HouseIntro., P1C.
2024-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2386 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback