TN HB2500 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1119
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1119
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, renames the health services and development agency as the health facilities commission; designates references to the health services and development agency in state law as references to the health facilities commission; requests the Tennessee code commission to amend references to the health services and development agency to the health facilities commission; requires the board of licensing health facilities to report to the health facilities commission instead of the department of health in the matter of licensing healthcare facilities; revises certain certificate of need provisions; revises other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 33; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to healthcare facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Clark Boyd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1119 | |
2022-04-27 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/13/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2466 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-03 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022