TN HB2496 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 705
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires the grantee under a solar power facility agreement to file a copy of the agreement with the office of energy programs in the department of environment and conservation; directs the office of energy programs to expand and maintain its existing website with additional guidance and resources regarding solar energy for various persons. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 5; Section 7-53-316 and Title 66, Chapter 9, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 5; Section 7-53-316 and Title 66, Chapter 9, Part 2, relative to solar power facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-17 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 705
2024-04-01HouseComp. SB subst.
2024-03-28HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/1/2024
2024-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2024
2024-03-19HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2024-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/19/2024
2024-03-13HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2024-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/13/2024
2024-03-06HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2024-03-06HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2024-02-28HousePlaced on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 3/6/2024
2024-02-27HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee
2024-02-21HousePlaced on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/27/2024
2024-02-06HouseAssigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee
2024-02-01HouseP2C, ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee
2024-01-31HouseIntro., P1C.
2024-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2486 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback