TN HB2493 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1005
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1005
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the commissioner of children's services to report annually to the governor, the chief clerk of the senate, and the chief clerk of the house on probation and juvenile justice evidence-based treatment services; requires other reporting by juvenile court clerks. - Amends TCA Title 37.
Title
As enacted, requires the commissioner of children's services to report annually to the governor, the chief clerk of the senate, and the chief clerk of the house on probation and juvenile justice evidence-based treatment services; requires other reporting by juvenile court clerks. - Amends TCA Title 37.
Sponsors
Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Rep. Barbara Cooper [D] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Rep. Karen Camper [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1005 | |
2016-04-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-13 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-04-07 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/7/2016 |
2016-04-05 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/5/2016 |
2016-03-30 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-03-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/9/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/2/2016 |
2016-02-23 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/9/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | P1C. |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro. |
2016-01-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2584 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 1005
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2493&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB2493.pdf |