TN HB2492 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-13 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-13 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes licensed plant dealers to market and do business through marketing affiliates with one or more corporate entities if the relationship between the dealer and each affiliate is clearly designated on the marketing affiliate’s promotional materials and the dealer and affiliate share the same location. - Amends TCA Title 43, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, authorizes licensed plant dealers to market and do business through marketing affiliates with one or more corporate entities if the relationship between the dealer and each affiliate is clearly designated on the marketing affiliate’s promotional materials and the dealer and affiliate share the same location. - Amends TCA Title 43, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Holt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2115 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee