TN HB2488 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires healthcare practitioners to provide certain information to patients prior to administering a vaccine. - Amends TCA Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, requires healthcare practitioners to provide certain information to patients prior to administering a vaccine. - Amends TCA Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Tilman Goins [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] |
Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Rep. Gary Hicks [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] |
Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Health Subcommittee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2018-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2482 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-07 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee