TN HB2487 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of human services to request approval from the federal department of agriculture to require that EBT cards for food stamps have a photo of the head of household; if approval granted, requires department of human services to replace all EBT cards to have photograph within 12 months of approval. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, requires the department of human services to request approval from the federal department of agriculture to require that EBT cards for food stamps have a photo of the head of household; if approval granted, requires department of human services to replace all EBT cards to have photograph within 12 months of approval. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5, Part 3.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Holt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Health Subcommittee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2334 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee