TN HB2485 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-13 - Taken off notice for cal. in Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-13 - Taken off notice for cal. in Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits the carry of a handgun by certain persons in areas of airports that are accessible to the public and outside of a secured area; creates misdemeanor offenses for violations of permitted carry at airports; permits carry of a handgun by certain persons on public transportation; preempts local regulations and postings that conflict. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13; Title 40; Title 42 and Title 64.
Title
As introduced, permits the carry of a handgun by certain persons in areas of airports that are accessible to the public and outside of a secured area; creates misdemeanor offenses for violations of permitted carry at airports; permits carry of a handgun by certain persons on public transportation; preempts local regulations and postings that conflict. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13; Title 40; Title 42 and Title 64.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Civil Justice Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Action def. in Civil Justice Committee to 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee-- Criminal Justice |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2335 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee