TN HB2484 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes criminal liability for possession on posted premises for a permit holder who immediately leaves posted premises upon being asked to do so. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1359.
Title
As introduced, removes criminal liability for possession on posted premises for a permit holder who immediately leaves posted premises upon being asked to do so. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1359.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Clark Boyd [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] |
Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY DUNN PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 39 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | Held on desk. |
2018-03-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-22 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-22 | House | Reset on cal. for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0751) |
2018-03-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/22/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/15/2018 |
2018-03-08 | House | Action def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 3/15/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/8/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-28 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-13 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/13/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2336 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-03 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee / no second