TN HB2483 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the composition of the state fair board and one of the board's powers. - Amends TCA Title 4; Section 5-9-102 and Title 43.
Title
As enacted, revises the composition of the state fair board and one of the board's powers. - Amends TCA Title 4; Section 5-9-102 and Title 43.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1014 | |
2018-04-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-23 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Held on desk. |
2018-04-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/5/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2297 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1014