TN HB2481 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, lowers amount of revenue required from sale of artwork from 90 percent to 80 percent in order for an art gallery that does not sell food or beverages to serve wine to patrons. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4, Part 1 and Title 57, Chapter 4, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, lowers amount of revenue required from sale of artwork from 90 percent to 80 percent in order for an art gallery that does not sell food or beverages to serve wine to patrons. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4, Part 1 and Title 57, Chapter 4, Part 3.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Freeman [D] | Rep. Bill Beck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 5/28/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2483 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee