TN HB2478 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits industrial development boards in Loudon County from negotiating payments in lieu of tax agreements for less than the county property taxes otherwise due. - Amends TCA Section 7-53-305.
Title
As introduced, prohibits industrial development boards in Loudon County from negotiating payments in lieu of tax agreements for less than the county property taxes otherwise due. - Amends TCA Section 7-53-305.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Local Government Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-13 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2284 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee