TN HB2473 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 904
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 904
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds an exemption from the licensure requirement for motor vehicle dealers for person to sell motor vehicles to licensed automotive dismantlers and recyclers, or to registered scrap metal processors - Amends TCA Title 55; Title 62 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, adds an exemption from the licensure requirement for motor vehicle dealers for person to sell motor vehicles to licensed automotive dismantlers and recyclers, or to registered scrap metal processors - Amends TCA Title 55; Title 62 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Pub. Ch. 904 | |
2016-05-02 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2016 | |
2016-04-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2016-04-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-14 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-12 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0847) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-04-07 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-04-07 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-04-07 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1028) |
2016-03-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-31 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/7/2016 |
2016-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2016 |
2016-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | Action def. in Business and Utilities Committee to 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/15/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2016-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | P1C. |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro. |
2016-01-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2471 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 904