TN HB2472 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 632
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 632
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the executive director of the student assistance corporation to temporarily suspend, modify, or waive deadlines or other non-academic eligibility requirements for student financial aid programs, if the governor has declared a state of emergency. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the executive director of the student assistance corporation to temporarily suspend, modify, or waive deadlines or other non-academic eligibility requirements for student financial aid programs, if the governor has declared a state of emergency. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Kirk Haston [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Pub. Ch. 632 | |
2020-04-06 | Effective date(s) 03/25/2020 | |
2020-03-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2020-03-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-03-20 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-03-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0655) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2020-03-19 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-03-19 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-03-19 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0678) |
2020-03-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1973 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 632