TN HB2466 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a local government from providing monetary assistance to an elective abortion provider. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9, Chapter 3 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9, Chapter 3 and Title 71, relative to local government finances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-22 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-03-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-21 | House | Passed H., Ayes 67, Nays 20, PNV 0 |
2022-03-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2444 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee