TN HB2463 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 742
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 742
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the deadline, from the last day of the sixth month following the end of the fiscal year to the last day of the ninth month, for an employer to file an annual certified financial statement with the department of commerce and insurance for purposes of showing the employer's ability to pay all workers compensation claims that may arise against the employer. - Amends TCA Section 50-6-405.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 50-6-405, relative to annual certified financial statements filed by employers.
Sponsors
Rep. Kent Calfee [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 742 | |
2022-03-14 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-03-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/14/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/10/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2353 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-04 - Effective date(s) 03/24/2022