TN HB2463 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 624
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 624
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that certain provisions related to the confidentiality of private records held by public utilities only apply to those records and not to all confidential records. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5.
Title
As enacted, clarifies that certain provisions related to the confidentiality of private records held by public utilities only apply to those records and not to all confidential records. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 624 | |
2020-03-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-03-12 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Meeting Canceled. Reset on State Committee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 2/19/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2247 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 624