TN HB2462 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 797
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 797
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows Sevier County, upon the adoption of a resolution by a two-thirds majority vote of the county legislative body, to assess a privilege tax on litigation in court cases in an amount not to exceed $100 per case to be used exclusively for the construction of a building to house legal proceedings and offices directly involved with the court system, and to renovate the county courthouse. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 6.
Title
As enacted, allows Sevier County, upon the adoption of a resolution by a two-thirds majority vote of the county legislative body, to assess a privilege tax on litigation in court cases in an amount not to exceed $100 per case to be used exclusively for the construction of a building to house legal proceedings and offices directly involved with the court system, and to renovate the county courthouse. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 6.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Farmer [R] | Rep. Dale Carr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 797 | |
2018-04-05 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/5/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-15 | House | Sponsor change. |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2719 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 797