TN HB2456 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows those pharmacies required to submit a quarterly report to the board of pharmacy regarding the quantity of sterile compounded products dispensed in a defined time period to do so by electronic means. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, allows those pharmacies required to submit a quarterly report to the board of pharmacy regarding the quantity of sterile compounded products dispensed in a defined time period to do so by electronic means. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2125 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee