TN HB2455 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1141
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1141
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes qualifications necessary to receive an occupational teaching license. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to occupational teaching licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1141 | |
2022-04-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-21 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar #2 for 4/21/2022 |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/13/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Action def. in Education Administration to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-22 | House | Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2442 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-06 - Effective date(s) 06/03/2022, 07/01/2023