TN HB2454 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-09 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-09 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requests the department and its division of health related boards to perform a study on the licensure and regulation of cannabis for medical use by departments of health and medical professional licensing boards in states contiguous to Tennessee and report findings to the general assembly's health committees by December 15, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 4, Chapter 3; Title 38, Chapter 3; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 43; Title 50; Title 53; Title 63; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, requests the department and its division of health related boards to perform a study on the licensure and regulation of cannabis for medical use by departments of health and medical professional licensing boards in states contiguous to Tennessee and report findings to the general assembly's health committees by December 15, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 4, Chapter 3; Title 38, Chapter 3; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 43; Title 50; Title 53; Title 63; Title 67 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 6/9/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 6/9/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee |
2020-02-25 | House | Ref. to Health Committee-- Judiciary-- Government Operations for Review |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2334 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0