TN HB2454 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, designates the book entitled They Said It Their Way: The Official Tennessee Book of By-Words and Old Sayings by Edwin Garrett as an official state book. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, designates the book entitled They Said It Their Way: The Official Tennessee Book of By-Words and Old Sayings by Edwin Garrett as an official state book. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Rep. John Windle [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-12 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-12 | House | Passed H., Ayes 85, Nays 1, PNV 3 |
2018-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/5/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2678 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-19 - Companion House Bill substituted