TN HB2453 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, directs the Tennessee advisory commission on intergovernmental relations (TACIR) to perform a study and make recommendations regarding privilege taxes on development by January 31, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, directs the Tennessee advisory commission on intergovernmental relations (TACIR) to perform a study and make recommendations regarding privilege taxes on development by January 31, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Sparks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2372 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee