TN HB2452 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-23 - Taken off notice for cal. in Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-23 - Taken off notice for cal. in Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, designates as an unlawful discriminatory practice certain actions taken by a person, public officer, public employee, governmental entity, employer, or place of public accommodation against an individual on the basis of the individual’s vaccination status, immunity status, or whether the person has an immunity passport; makes various other changes related to COVID-19. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 14; Title 39; Title 50; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 14; Title 39; Title 50; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to medical discrimination.
Sponsors
Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Brandon Ogles [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Rusty Grills [R] |
Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Todd Warner [R] | Rep. Clay Doggett [R] | Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] |
Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] |
Rep. Jay Reedy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Civil Justice Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee -- State Government Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2151 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-22 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee